WA HB2753 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective Date Contingent on Sine Die of the 1st Special Session or no later than July 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective Date Contingent on Sine Die of the 1st Special Session or no later than July 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a workforce housing program.
Title
Creating a workforce housing program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Effective Date Contingent on Sine Die of the 1st Special Session or no later than July 13, 2010. | |
2010-03-26 | Chapter 6, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-03-26 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-23 | President signed. | |
2010-03-23 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed final passage; yeas, 71; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-22 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-20 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 9. | |
2010-03-20 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-20 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-20 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-20 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-20 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-20 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-17 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. | |
2010-03-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-15 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-21 | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6589 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.