WA HB2749 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a local sales and use tax as a credit against the state sales tax for rural high-speed internet infrastructure without increasing the total sales and use tax rate.
Title
Allowing a local sales and use tax as a credit against the state sales tax for rural high-speed internet infrastructure without increasing the total sales and use tax rate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2749&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2749.pdf |