WA HB2748 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the learning assistance program.
Title
Modifying the learning assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-08 | House | House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate insists on its position and asks House to concur. |
2018-03-03 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2018-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Education. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-30 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Education |