WA HB2747 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a deduction for out-of-pocket medical expenses from the calculation of disposable income for senior property tax programs.
Title
Allowing a deduction for out-of-pocket medical expenses from the calculation of disposable income for senior property tax programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2747&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2747.pdf |