WA HB2747 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the use of restraints on pregnant women or youth.
Title
Limiting the use of restraints on pregnant women or youth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Chapter 181, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-13 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-02-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6500 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.