WA HB2746 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning mental health and chemical dependency treatment for juvenile offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning mental health and chemical dependency treatment for juvenile offenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-31HouseEffective date 6/9/2016.
2016-03-31HouseChapter 106, 2016 Laws.
2016-03-31HouseGovernor signed.
2016-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2016-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2016-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2016-03-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2016-03-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2016-02-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2016-02-29SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2016-02-29SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM.
2016-02-26SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2016-02-26SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2016-02-26SenateHSMH - Majority; do pass.
2016-02-25SenatePublic hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
2016-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
2016-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2016-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-02-17HouseFloor amendment
2016-02-17House1st substitute bill substituted
2016-02-17HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2016-02-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2016-02-09HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2016-02-09HouseMinority; do not pass.
2016-02-09HouseAPP - Majority; do pass ELHS 16 bill proposed by Early Learning & Human Services.
2016-02-09HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2016-02-04HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2016-02-02HouseELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2016-02-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
2016-01-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
2016-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback