WA HB2744 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving environmental and social outcomes associated with the production of building materials.
Title
Improving environmental and social outcomes associated with the production of building materials.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |