WA HB2743 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the integration of reclaimed water, water system planning, and groundwater source protection.
Title
Concerning the integration of reclaimed water, water system planning, and groundwater source protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Paul Graves [R] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB6390 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.