WA HB2742 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the management and oversight of personal data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the management and oversight of personal data.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-07HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-07HouseITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.

Same As/Similar To

SB6281 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Conference committee appointed. Senators Carlyle, Dhingra, Rivers.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback