WA HB2739 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Effective date 3/17/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Effective date 3/17/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting certain requirements of the shared leave program.
Title
Adjusting certain requirements of the shared leave program.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Rep. Davina Duerr [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Effective date 3/17/2020*. |
2020-03-17 | House | Chapter 6, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2020-03-09 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-31 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |