WA HB2739 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning veterans' assistance levies.
Title
Concerning veterans' assistance levies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |