WA HB2736 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the governor to prioritize gender equality when making appointments and reappointments to state boards, commissions, and councils.
Title
Encouraging the governor to prioritize gender equality when making appointments and reappointments to state boards, commissions, and councils.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | SG - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 9:00 AM. |
2016-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2736&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2736.pdf |