WA HB2735 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public disclosure of certain information procured or obtained pursuant to a loan or grant application under the underground storage tank revolving loan and grant program.
Title
Concerning public disclosure of certain information procured or obtained pursuant to a loan or grant application under the underground storage tank revolving loan and grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-22 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |