WA HB2734 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing federally qualified community health centers to buy surplus real property from the department of transportation.
Title
Allowing federally qualified community health centers to buy surplus real property from the department of transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-22 | Chapter 157, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-22 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 74; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-01 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |