WA HB2731 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an early learning program for educationally at-risk children.
Title
Creating an early learning program for educationally at-risk children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-29 | Chapter 231, 2010 Laws PV. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed final passage; yeas, 70; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-11 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-10 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-10 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-08 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment not adopted. | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-25 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-08 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-22 | ELCS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-22 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. |