WA HB2725 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming foster resource parents.
Title
Renaming foster resource parents.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |