WA HB2718 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing consumer protections for military members on active duty.
Title
Providing consumer protections for military members on active duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-28 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:30 AM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |