WA HB2711 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning electric vehicle charging stations.
Title
Concerning electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Sen. Cyrus Habib [D] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Roger Freeman [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |