WA HB2710 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying the uses, disclosure, and requirement dates of prescription drug price transparency data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying the uses, disclosure, and requirement dates of prescription drug price transparency data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2020-02-28SenatePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-16HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-04HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback