WA HB2699 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting alcohol manufacturers from the food storage warehouse license.
Title
Exempting alcohol manufacturers from the food storage warehouse license.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Terry Nealey [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-15 | House | Chapter 96, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB6380 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-15 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.