WA HB2698 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning paraeducators.
Title
Concerning paraeducators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-29 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB6388 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.