WA HB2696 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the misbranding of meat and poultry products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the misbranding of meat and poultry products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-05HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-05HouseRDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

SB6329 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback