WA HB2694 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an informational program to increase applications from high-achieving low-income students to selective institutions of higher education.
Title
Creating an informational program to increase applications from high-achieving low-income students to selective institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Hansen [D] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Rep. Roger Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | HIE - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPE - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |