WA HB2687 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing appropriated funding for public defense services.
Title
Increasing appropriated funding for public defense services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2687&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2687.pdf |