WA HB2684 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying time period and monetary limits on ferry vessel and terminal work by state forces. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Removing time period limitations on ferry vessel and terminal work by state forces. )
Title
Modifying time period and monetary limits on ferry vessel and terminal work by state forces. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Removing time period limitations on ferry vessel and terminal work by state forces. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB6443 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.