WA HB2682 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Providing automatic voter registration at qualified voter registration agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing automatic voter registration at qualified voter registration agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-15 - House of Representatives - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2016-02-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
2016-02-15HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2016-02-15HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-02-15House1st substitute bill substituted
2016-02-11HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2016-02-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2016-02-09HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2016-02-09HouseMinority; do not pass.
2016-02-09HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2016-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2016-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2016-01-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2016-01-26HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2016-01-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2016-01-26HouseSG - Majority; do pass.
2016-01-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 10:00 AM.
2016-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM.
2016-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government

Same As/Similar To

SB6379 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback