WA HB2682 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting hop grower lot information used in the state department of agriculture export document from public disclosure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting hop grower lot information used in the state department of agriculture export document from public disclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-22HouseChapter 170, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-22HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2018-02-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-22SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2018-02-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-30HouseAGNR - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback