WA HB2677 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing permissible methods of parking a motorcycle.
Title
Establishing permissible methods of parking a motorcycle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |