WA HB2676 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing minimum requirements for the testing of autonomous vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing minimum requirements for the testing of autonomous vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-27HouseChapter 182, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-27HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10HousePassed final passage; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-02-19HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-19HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-19HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-19House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM.
2020-02-10HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

SB6659 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - First reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2676&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2676.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2676-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2676-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2676-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2676-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121616&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-19-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2676&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121616&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2676&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121616&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2676&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback