WA HB2675 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating workforce investment act references and making no substantive changes.
Title
Updating workforce investment act references and making no substantive changes.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | HIE - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-29 | House | HE - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB6457 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.