WA HB2673 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a tax preference for nonrural data centers.
Title
Providing a tax preference for nonrural data centers.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Joyce McDonald [R] |
Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB6307 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-01 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development & International Trade at 8:00 AM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2673&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2673.pdf |