WA HB2672 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective Date Contingent on Sine Die of the 1st Special Session or no later than July 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective Date Contingent on Sine Die of the 1st Special Session or no later than July 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax relief for aluminum smelters.
Title
Concerning tax relief for aluminum smelters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Effective Date Contingent on Sine Die of the 1st Special Session or no later than July 13, 2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 2, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-19 | President signed. | |
2010-03-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-18 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2010-03-18 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-18 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-17 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-17 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-17 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-15 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-09 | FIN - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6331 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.