WA HB2670 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Providing services and supports to pregnant and parenting minors to improve educational attainment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing services and supports to pregnant and parenting minors to improve educational attainment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-31HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-31HouseELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback