WA HB2665 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating certain requirements for the annexation of an unincorporated island of territory.
Title
Eliminating certain requirements for the annexation of an unincorporated island of territory.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB6312 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.