WA HB2664 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending existing telecommunications authority to all ports in Washington state in order to facilitate public-private partnerships in wholesale telecommunications services and infrastructure.
Title
Extending existing telecommunications authority to all ports in Washington state in order to facilitate public-private partnerships in wholesale telecommunications services and infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. William Jenkin [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage without Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 169, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2018-03-05 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | EENT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB6426 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM.