WA HB2661 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding accessible, affordable child care and early childhood development programs.
Title
Expanding accessible, affordable child care and early childhood development programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |