WA HB2659 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding eligibility for the early childhood education and assistance program.
Title
Expanding eligibility for the early childhood education and assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2659&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2659.pdf |