WA HB2659 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying reporting requirements for timber purchases.
Title
Modifying reporting requirements for timber purchases.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] |
Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-24 | Chapter 197, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-24 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | NROR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | AGNR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |