WA HB2653 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the alternative fuel vehicle sales and use tax exemptions for the purposes of expanding the exemptions and amending related provisions.
Title
Modifying the alternative fuel vehicle sales and use tax exemptions for the purposes of expanding the exemptions and amending related provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 8:00 AM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |