WA HB2649 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing the fish, shellfish, and wildlife-related recreational opportunities for a person with a disability.
Title
Enhancing the fish, shellfish, and wildlife-related recreational opportunities for a person with a disability.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. James Wilcox [R] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Terry Nealey [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 168, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-24 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |