WA HB2643 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning educator recertification requirements regarding youth suicide screening, referral, and safety planning.
Title
Concerning educator recertification requirements regarding youth suicide screening, referral, and safety planning.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] |
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Mike Steele [R] |
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |