WA HB2640 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting liability for registered apiarists.
Title
Limiting liability for registered apiarists.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] |
Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |