WA HB2635 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a military benefit zone program.
Title
Creating a military benefit zone program.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] |
Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-25 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB6272 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-01 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development & International Trade at 8:00 AM.