WA HB2627 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorizations of proposals for emergency medical care and service levies.
Title
Concerning authorizations of proposals for emergency medical care and service levies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | House | Chapter 136, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 61; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |