WA HB2625 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local parks funding options.
Title
Concerning local parks funding options.
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Keith Goehner [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2020-01-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-24 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |