WA HB2624 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring employers to provide exclusive bargaining representatives reasonable access to new employees for the purposes of presenting information about their exclusive bargaining representative.
Title
Requiring employers to provide exclusive bargaining representatives reasonable access to new employees for the purposes of presenting information about their exclusive bargaining representative.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-22 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Same As/Similar To
SB6229 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2624&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2624.pdf |