WA HB2618 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying provisions governing public works projects of code cities.
Title
Modifying provisions governing public works projects of code cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |