WA HB2617 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating certain boards and commissions.
Title
Eliminating certain boards and commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Effective date 6/10/2010*. | |
2010-03-29 | Chapter 7, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-23 | President signed. | |
2010-03-23 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-19 | Passed final passage; yeas, 89; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2010-03-19 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-18 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 8. | |
2010-03-18 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-18 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-18 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-03-17 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. | |
2010-03-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-15 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-10 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-09 | WAYS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-03-09 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-03-09 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-26 | SGTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6426 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.