WA HB2616 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the definition of eligible pupil for purposes of the transitional bilingual instruction program.
Title
Expanding the definition of eligible pupil for purposes of the transitional bilingual instruction program.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-29 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2616&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2616.pdf |