WA HB2615 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving student success at community and technical colleges by considering benefits of full-time faculty and staff.
Title
Improving student success at community and technical colleges by considering benefits of full-time faculty and staff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2016-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-09 | House | APP - Majority; do pass HE 16 bill proposed by Higher Education. |
2016-02-09 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |